CROSSLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1182129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide activities to residents of local areas of Freehold, Werneth and Crossley, Chadderton in Oldham. We focus on the needs and demands of the local area, as well as offering space for private functions in our purpose built community centre. We also provide local fast grants to support local community projects that improve and/or support the locality. Local residents act as trustees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £37,387
Total expenditure: £31,310

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Oldham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RYAN SMITH BA HONS Chair 19 February 2019
PRIMROSE BANK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
COUNCILLOR COLIN MCLAREN Trustee 19 February 2019
MOSTON AND DISTRICT SPORTS AND YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
OLDHAM PLAY ACTION GROUP
Received: On time
MOSTON AND DISTRICT SPORTS AND YOUTH CLUB
Received: On time
CHADDERTON FEDERATION OF COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS
Received: 16 days late
Sonja Costello Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record
Mary Elizabeth Moulton Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record
Abdul Zakariya BSc PGCE Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.67k £30.38k £10.92k £30.59k £37.39k
Total expenditure £27.86k £19.72k £12.62k £35.55k £31.31k
Income from government contracts £5.20k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.96k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 February 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 March 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 March 2022 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CROSSLEY CENTRE
323 DENTON LANE
CHADDERTON
OLDHAM
OL9 9GA
Phone:
01616521419
Website:

No information available