THE ADRIAN DERBYSHIRE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity that offers education and support regarding Stigma, Bullying and HateCrime.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diana Cameron | Trustee | 21 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN DERBYSHIRE | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
GARY SKENTELBERY | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £24.81k | £8.55k | £3.46k | £7.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.66k | £25.22k | £12.61k | £3.67k | £7.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2024 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2024 | 367 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 November 2022 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 January 2022 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2022 | 447 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 February 2022 | 459 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING EDUCATION INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE SUBJECTS OF SELF HARM, DISCRIMINATION, BULLYING AND HATE CRIME, MENTAL HEALTH, ADDICTIONS AND THE IMPORTANCE OF HEALTHY EATING, SPORT AND EXERCISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 LEICESTER STREET
WARRINGTON
WA5 1TA
- Phone:
- 07498 210069
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window