FUTURE TALENT MUSICIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through our provision of access to performance and development opportunities, mentoring and financial support, we strive to achieve an equal reality where all gifted and underprivileged young musicians flourish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- FUTURE TALENT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Robinson | Chair | 01 December 2004 |
|
|
||||
Erin Mary Hanley Townsend | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Butty | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna van der Linden | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Louise Edinborough Ortiz | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Counter | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER HASELDEN | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Kieran Jones | Trustee | 08 October 2021 |
|
|||||
John Sendama | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN WORSLEY | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
KRYSTYNA BUDZYNSKA | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GREGOR BAMERT | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DUCHESS KATHARINE KENT | Trustee | 01 December 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.45k | £232.63k | £298.84k | £309.37k | £396.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.22k | £266.65k | £286.12k | £309.02k | £400.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE SPECIALIST MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH: (A) THE FUNDING OF MUSICAL RESOURCES; (B) ARRANGING AND FUNDING MUSICAL TUITION, PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES AND EXPOSURE TO SPECIALIST RESOURCES; AND (C) ANY OTHER MEANS THAT THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Future Talent Musicians
Chester House CH3.24
Kennington Park
1-3 Brixton Road
London
SW9 6DE
- Phone:
- 02080370272
- Email:
- info@futuretalent.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window