CYCA Connecting Youth Children and Adults

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide child care nursery, after school club and holiday Clubs in 3 settings. We provide a range of services that address personal development.We work with Looked after Children mentoring them and giving training to move into their own home. Our Training Centre provides opportunities for our learners to gain accredited qualifications around essential skills resiliency and emotional wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £129,306 from 1 government contract(s) and £255,794 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 22 June 1982: Standard registration
- CYCA (Working name)
- CARMARTHENSHIRE YOUTH AND CHILDREN'S ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- LLANELLI YOUTH AND CHILDREN'S ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernardine Rees | Chair | 25 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNMARIE THOMAS | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Frederick StJohn Roberts | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Wiliams | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Rees | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beth Leyshon | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVE ROYSTON MEARS | Trustee | 13 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £593.26k | £590.99k | £311.68k | £712.21k | £469.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £494.45k | £576.69k | £472.83k | £610.63k | £553.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £204.15k | £101.23k | £129.31k | |
|
Income from government grants | £396.87k | £481.73k | £3.46k | £282.35k | £255.79k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £445.48k | £532.41k | N/A | £661.48k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £16.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £81.56k | £25.99k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £36.87k | £32.60k | N/A | £33.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £29.35k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £494.45k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £576.69k | N/A | £608.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £494.45k | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £1.66k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1998, AS AMENDED 2 AUGUST 2001, AS AMENDED 3 NOVEMBER 2004, 30 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 25 NOVEMBER 2009. as amended on 29 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES RESIDENT IN CARMARTHENSHIRE, BEING FACILITIES (A) OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN HAVE BEEN BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND (B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
CARMARTHENSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CYCA
Unit 2
Dragon 24
North Dock
LLANELLI
Dyfed
- Phone:
- 01554776178
- Email:
- support@cycaonline.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window