Friends of the Anglican Province of Alexandria

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to advance the Christian faith in the UK, North Africa and the Horn of Africa by enabling and maintaining the work of the Episcopal/Anglican Diocese of Egypt with North Africa and the Horn of Africa, providing and maintaining church buildings and enabling worship, pastoral care,outreach and witness, training, healthcare,the relief of poverty, development and publishing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Djibouti
- Egypt
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Libya
- Somalia
- Tunisia
Governance
- 17 December 2018: CIO registration
- 29 July 2019: Funds received from 209145 EGYPT DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION
- EGYPT DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cathy Terry | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Justyn Terry | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Rev ADEL SALAH MAKAR SHOKRALLA | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ANGELA ANN HUDDART | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev MICHAEL JOHN PARKER | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Elizabeth Fraser | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Maddox | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
CANON CHRISTOPHER PAUL ANDREWS | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Canon Richard Charles Hibbert | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev ANDREW CHARLES WHEELER | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Judith Mary Spencer-Gregson | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Dr PETER LE FEUVRE | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.68k | £18.08k | £30.83k | £24.66k | £66.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.13k | £18.52k | £28.45k | £26.72k | £61.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Dec 2018 as amended on 28 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK, NORTH AFRICA AND THE HORN OF AFRICA MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROVIDING GRANTS TO · ENABLE AND MAINTAIN THE WORK OF THE EPISCOPAL/ANGLICAN DIOCESE OF EGYPT WITH NORTH AFRICA AND THE HORN OF AFRICA AND ITS ORDAINED AND LAY MEMBERS AND INSTITUTIONS · PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN ITS CHURCH BUILDINGS · ENABLE PUBLIC WORSHIP AND PASTORAL CARE; OUTREACH AND WITNESS; TRAINING AND EDUCATION; HEALTHCARE; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND NEED; DEVELOPMENT; AND PUBLISHING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 17
Hartington Mansions
Hartington Place
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN21 3BJ
- Phone:
- +447941330432
- Email:
- secretaryfapa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window