SPARKFORD RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION GROUP

Charity number: 1179616
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Riding for the Disabled Group

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £1,027
Total expenditure: £1,695

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 August 2018: CIO registration
  • 02 November 2018: Funds received from 1074202 SPARKFORD RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION GROU...
  • 14 November 2024: Funds transferred to 244108 RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING ...
  • 14 November 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £911 £1.47k £83 £892 £1.03k
Total expenditure £1.28k £3.04k £450 £1.15k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 November 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window