BRECKNOCK SINFONIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Brecknock Sinfonia Trust presents concerts of orchestral and chamber music in Brecon Cathedral and surrounding areas, providing opportunities for local musicians, particularly young musicians, to play at a high standard. BST fosters links with other music societies, including South Powys Youth Music. See:www.brecknocksinfonia.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Monmouthshire
- Powys
Governance
- 10 June 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN JAMES COOK | Chair | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dorcas Anne Slaney | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN SCOTT COLLINS | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
VAUGHAN IAN BENNETT FCCA | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|||||
JANET RAYNER FOSTER | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|||||
SONIA ELAINE HAMMOND | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PATRICIA HANKEY | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.33k | £4.93k | £4.51k | £7.73k | £13.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.99k | £985 | £4.80k | £9.30k | £14.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 March 2025 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR ORCHESTRAL MUSIC, BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH: I) THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS II) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MUSICIANS, PARTICULARLY YOUNG MUSICIANS, TO PARTICIPATE IN PERFORMANCES OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC III) FOSTERING LINKS WITH NEIGHBOURING MUSIC ORGANISATIONS, SCHOOLS AND YOUTH GROUPS TO ENHANCE EDUCATION IN MUSIC AND ITS PERFORMANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Cerrig
Llangynidr
Powys
NP8 1LN
- Phone:
- 01874 730699
- Email:
- susiecello@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window