THE SURESERVE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sureserve Foundation exists to warm the communities in the UK served by our public and private buildings. We provide support in 2 key ways; through Information, Advice and Guidance to combat fuel poverty and inefficient energy use and intervention measures across our community network to enhance energy savings in the home via our grant programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian David Childs | Chair | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Small | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Siarah Meah | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Joy Nicklin | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean John Ivor Fitzgerald | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Heanan | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian James Horton | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Simone Lynn Clarke | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Uta Maria Luise Hope MA MInstF | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MIREN JOSEPHINE RAWLINGS | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.35k | £49.85k | £129.72k | £73.51k | £145.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £30.01k | £62.35k | £58.38k | £47.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE WHO ARE VULNERABLE AS A RESULT OF HIGH FUEL EXPENDITURE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A. PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL AND ADVICE SERVICES TO COMBAT FUEL POVERTY AND INEFFICIENT ENERGY USE; AND B. DELIVERING PROJECTS IN COLLABORATION WITH INDUSTRY PARTNERS TO PROVIDE ENERGY EFFICIENT HOME AND COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENTS TO COMBAT FUEL INEFFICIENCY AND THUS POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Norfolk House
13 Southampton Place
Holborn
London
WC1A 2AJ
- Phone:
- 020 3961 5218
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window