GLOBAL SIKH COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Sikh religion for the public benefit worldwide, in accordance with the teachings of the Sikh Scripture, the Sri Guru Granth Sahib, and the 1945 Sikh Rehat Maryada (Sikh Code of Conduct), in particular to provide a global forum to promote equality and respect for diversity in different countries in line with the teachings of the Sikh faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Australia
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Canada
- Dubai
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Italy
- Kenya
- Malaysia
- Mauritius
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Pakistan
- Portugal
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Uganda
- United States
Governance
- 13 November 2019: Standard registration
- GSC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paramjit Singh Bedi | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ram Singh Rathor | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanjeet Singh | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gurprit Kaur Chadha | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kanwaljit Singh Lady | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Satnam Singh Poonian | Trustee | 16 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harsaran Singh | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Gurdial Singh | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Jagir Singh | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.96k | £7.48k | £7.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WORLDWIDE, IN ACCORDANCE THE TEACHINGS OF THE SIKH SCRIPTURE, THE SRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB, AND THE 1945 SIKH REYAT MARYADA (SIKH CODE OF CONDUCT), IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PROVIDING A GLOBAL FORUM TO PROMOTE A WIDER UNDERSTANDING OF THE TEACHINGS; AND (B)ACTING IN AN ADVISORY CAPACITY TO HELP SETTLE DISPUTES INVOLVING SIKH GURDWARAS AND MEMBER SIKH ORGANIZATIONS WITH THE CONSENT OF THE ORGANISATIONS CONCERNED. 3.2 THE PROMOTION EQUALITY & DIVERSITY IN DIFFERENT COUNTRIES, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO RELIGIOUS FREEDOM AND TOLERANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A)THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RELIGION; (B)CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C)EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (D)PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Dorset Road
Merton Park
LONDON
SW19 3EZ
- Phone:
- 0716497376
- Email:
- kaursingh3@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window