Financial history THE BEACON CENTRE

Charity number: 1181149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £25.00k £25.00k £40.44k £67.33k £64.83k
Total expenditure £7.93k £7.93k £19.61k £70.87k £87.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £700