SUCCESS CLUB CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Success Club provides support and learning opportunities to children and young people which enhance wellbeing, personal, social, and emotional development, and self-understanding. We promote pro-social core attitudes and beliefs for the benefit of the school environment, local community and general public. We also aim to prevent school exclusion and offer a bespoke programme to support this aim
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £38,620 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 November 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Owen Challis | Chair | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Halissey | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellis Goodson | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Delacour | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mustafa Berk Ak | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sachelle Samuda | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Clarence Douglin | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elisabet Coffi Rope | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marva Yvonne Rollins | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Christopher James Cuddihy | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.05k | £169.84k | £161.51k | £237.64k | £252.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.64k | £152.22k | £153.05k | £214.35k | £226.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £19.09k | £58.59k | £38.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A. PROVIDING SUPPORT AND LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHICH ENHANCE PARTICIPANTS' PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND EFFECTIVE TRANSITION TO SECONDARY EDUCATION; B. PROMOTING PRO-SOCIAL CORE ATTITUDES AND BELIEFS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SCHOOL ENVIRONMENT, LOCAL COMMUNITY AND GENERAL PUBLIC; AND C. PROVIDING LEARNING, UNDERSTANDING AND TRAINING TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS, ENTITIES OR INDIVIDUALS WHO WORK WITH OR ASPIRE TO WORK WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Morley Hill
Enfield
EN2 0BJ
- Phone:
- 07510911096
- Email:
- tonyd@successclub.org.uk
- Website:
-
successclub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window