Trustees WARWICKSHIRE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 512915
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Stothard | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Thompson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Brough | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Tucker | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bronia Costello | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lomas | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Diane Wildish | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Beale | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bubb | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Rachel Livingston | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Beverley Suffell | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Williams | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Heather Wilson | Trustee | 02 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Betts | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.