WORLD HOPE INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works with World Hope International to provide international aid to those in need following events which damage communities and infrastructure. The charity also provides community building, education and support to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Albania
- Azerbaijan
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Cambodia
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Liberia
- Mozambique
- Nepal
- Philippines
- Sierra Leone
- Sri Lanka
- Zambia
Governance
- 18 September 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENJAMIN DAVID JAMES | Chair | 16 August 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Jonathan Cope West | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
John Donald Clause | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2021 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1 FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; 2 FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; 3 FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED DUE TO YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THE RELIEF OF WHICH IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES; 4 FOR THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY RELIEF AND CRISIS INTERVENTION FOLLOWING NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO INDIVIDUALS, GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND BODIES ASSISTING WITH SUCH RELIEF AND DIRECT INTERVENTION BY THE PROVISION OF CRISIS RELIEF AND SUPPORT; 5 THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY; 6 THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (II) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (IV) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR EITHER UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE OR PEOPLE EMPLOYED IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP IN EITHER SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; (V) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (VI) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; (VII) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; (VIII) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (IX) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES; 7 THE PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR IN ANY COUNTRY IN THE WORLD, PROVIDED THAT SUCH PROMOTION IS GENERALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OR A SUFFICIENT SECTION OF THE PUBLIC. FOR THESE PURPOSES THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR MEANS ANY CHARITY WHICH IS REGISTERED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD UNDERTAKING ACTIVITIES WHICH WOULD BE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND INDEPENDENT VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES WHICH ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE OR TO A SIGNIFICANT PROPORTION OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA IN WHICH THEY OPERATE WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTIONS FROM MAKING A PROFIT; 8 PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES REGISTERED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES; 9 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF THE WORLD IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; 10 FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
McCarthy Denning
Minster House
42 Mincing Lane
LONDON
EC3R 7AE
- Phone:
- 02039269900
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window