STRUT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mentor children and young adults with special needs to gain independence, social skills and self confidence; Engage young people in Lincolnshire who have special needs in activities that will nourish their personal development; Provide excellent quality short breaks for young people aged 8 to 19 years; Provide advocacy services which meet the needs of young people and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 09 August 1982: Standard registration
- 02 May 2024: Funds received from 1129461 FLIGHTS FOR LIFE
- STRUT IN THE COMMUNITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr CAROL PENELOPE MILLNS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KIDS | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/07/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/12/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SUFFERING BY PROVIDING A CARING ENVIRONMENT FOR CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 19 WHO LIVE IN OR NEAR LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE. 2. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES IN THE FORM OF PARENT SUPPORT GROUPS AND SIBLING GROUPS
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STRUT IN THE COMMUNITY
UNIT 4
OUTER CIRCLE ROAD
LINCOLN
LN2 4HX
- Phone:
- 01522527292
- Email:
- strutenquiries@kids.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window