MELTON AND DISTRICT MONEY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MADMAC provides a free, confidential and impartial advice service for the people of Melton Mowbray and neighbouring districts concerning money and debt. It provides a personalised package of care until financial freedom is gained encouraging the reduction and occurrence of future debt problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,100 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 22 November 2018: CIO registration
- MADMAC (Working name)
- MELTON & DISTRICT MONEY ADVICE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Dunn | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Chubb | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev John Barr | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harry Pepper | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.95k | £124.44k | £124.08k | £144.64k | £175.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.48k | £108.16k | £95.44k | £117.84k | £143.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.50k | N/A | N/A | £2.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN MELTON MOWBRAY AND THE DISTRICT BY PROVIDING A FREE CONFIDENTIAL AND IMPARTIAL ADVICE SERVICE CONCERNING MONEY AND DEBT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MADMAC At The Fox
9 Leicester Street
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE13 0PP
- Phone:
- 07775942046
- Email:
- amanda@madmacmoney.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window