JULIAN HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Julian House provides a range of services to socially excluded people across the South West; particularly in the areas of homelessness, domestic abuse and community rehabilitation. We operate a range of supported housing projects, emergency hostel accommodation, advice services, assertive outreach support and a number of social enterprises. Not just changing lives. Often saving lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£10,017,747
Donations and legacies | £1.08m | |
Charitable activities | £7.74m | |
Other trading activities | £1.14m | |
Investments | £52.74k | |
Other | £4.60k |
Total expenditure:
£9,857,197
Raising funds | £1.46m | |
Charitable activities | £8.40m | |
Other | £0 |
£88,668 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,116,454 from 58 government contract(s) and £854 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.46m | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.40m | |
Retained for future use | £160.55k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.46m | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.40m | |
Retained for future use | £249.22k |
People

171 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
148 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- JH Bristol (Working name)
- SEE CHANGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma J Cooke | Chair | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marek Tadeusz Koperski | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Butters | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Carol Ferguson | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naji Anwaar Darwish | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy David Hinton White | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ken Russell | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian House | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy William Mitchell | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Antony Pugh | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Lloyd Jobbins | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.73m | £7.25m | £8.15m | £7.64m | £10.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.41m | £6.67m | £6.88m | £7.72m | £9.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.33m | £2.38m | £2.65m | £3.39m | £4.12m | |
|
Income from government grants | £200.00k | £290.34k | £110.71k | £26.12k | £854 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £824.87k | £1.15m | £1.27m | £851.88k | £1.08m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.34m | £806.41k | £1.17m | £1.21m | £1.14m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.51m | £4.99m | £5.06m | £5.56m | £7.74m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £260 | £404 | £289 | £15.09k | £52.74k | |
|
Income - Other | £10.24k | £305.81k | £648.83k | £4.08k | £4.60k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £97.04k | £102.46k | £25.79k | £40.31k | £123.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.10m | £5.10m | £5.37m | £6.30m | £8.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £307.85k | £1.56m | £1.51m | £1.42m | £1.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £60.37k | £37.07k | £40.05k | £45.58k | £77.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.84k | £8.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.78m | £2.53m | £1.93m | £1.91m | £1.85m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.26m | £1.37m | |
|
Other assets | £1.47m | £2.34m | £4.23m | £3.08m | £3.69m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£33.00k | -£44.00k | -£62.00k | -£56.00k | -£48.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.44m | £1.49m | £1.52m | £1.70m | £2.12m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO CARRY ON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING AND MANAGING HOUSING, INCLUDING SOCIAL HOUSING, AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR PEOPLE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, POOR PEOPLE OR FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; (B) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT, HOMELESSNESS AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING INDIVIDUALS IN CHARITABLE NEED WITH SUCH TRAINING, SUPPORT AND EMPLOYMENT AND OTHER OPPORTUNITIES, AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; AND (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. "SOCIAL HOUSING" MEANS LOW COST RENTAL ACCOMMODATION AND LOW COST HOME OWNERSHIP ACCOMMODATION AS DEFINED IN SECTIONS 68 TO 77 OF THE HOUSING AND REGENERATION ACT 2008;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Julian House
1 Kelso Place
Upper Bristol Road
BATH
BA1 3AU
- Phone:
- 01225354650
- Email:
- admin@julianhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window