Financial history OXFORD HUB

Charity number: 1180505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £383.11k £683.30k £835.13k £559.03k £642.17k
Total expenditure £302.82k £428.71k £679.71k £657.51k £603.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £90.49k £122.02k
Income from government grants £52.16k £224.57k £305.72k £95.00k £49.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £576.38k £794.05k £465.82k £509.98k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £6.29k £3.61k £1.40k £1.34k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £100.64k £37.43k £90.49k £122.02k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £39 £1.32k £8.84k
Income - Other N/A £0 £8 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £419.97k £664.77k £644.34k £591.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £8.75k £14.48k £13.18k £12.72k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £3.08k £4.20k £2.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £50.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £457 £0 £0