THE ANDY BIDDLE YOUTH SPORTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help fund youth sport in Sutton Coldfield for the public benefit. In particular football and cricket, sports dear to the late Andy Biddle. To achieve these aims by fundraising and inviting grant applications to be considered by the Trustees periodically.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 11 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Brookes | Chair | 09 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Anthony Cottrell | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Peter Ball | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul HERON Mr | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Mackey Mr | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Biddle Mr | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.32k | £2.99k | £3.47k | £17.60k | £9.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.29k | £3.78k | £1.75k | £12.93k | £12.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 April 2024 | 229 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 16 April 2024 | 229 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PARTICIPATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 YEARS IN AMATEUR SPORT IN SUTTON COLDFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA BY MAKING GRANTS TO, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO COMMUNITY AMATEUR SPORTS CLUBS, OTHER AMATEUR SPORTS CLUBS AND SCHOOLS PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR AMATEUR SPORT AND AMATEUR INDIVIDUALS WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON FOOTBALL AND CRICKET IN MEMORY OF ANDY BIDDLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 129 Foley Road West
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B74 3NZ
- Phone:
- 07793 980772
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window