Trustees MONTGOMERY YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS
Charity number: 1180654

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELGAN JARMAN | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|||||
JOSS DAVIES | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
MABLI JOHNSON | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Oliver | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Owen | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
KYLE CONNOLLY | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
WIL WORTHINGTON | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
DYFAN JONES | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIN LEWIS | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELEN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NIALL MORGAN | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JACK RICHARDS | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
HUW JONES | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELERI ROBERTS | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
BETHAN BREEZE | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
TONICHA HORN | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
FFION SUCKLEY-JONES | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Griffiths | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
NON OWEN | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
LUCY MORGAN | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
CARA SMITH | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|||||
GRUG EVANS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LOWRI DAVIES | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL DAVIES | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
TRYSTAN EDWARDS | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA OWEN | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELOISA ISAAC | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MEINIR WIGLEY | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALUN TUDOR THOMAS | Trustee | 13 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MORGAN | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.