CHESTER SHAH JALAL JAME MOSQUE & ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY The aim and objectives of the Mosque and Islamic centre are: To advance the Islamic faith of the inhabitants of Chester and its surrounding areas and in particular, although not exclusively, of the Bangladeshi Muslim inhabitants through prayer, worship, religious teaching and services and the establishment of a mosque and Islamic Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Flintshire
Governance
- 14 March 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED MONCHAB ALI | Chair | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
AMDADUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD KAMAL MIAH SHAH | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MD MAMUN MIAH | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
BHUIYAN SHAMSUDDIN | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
BASHIR AHMED CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ENAMUL ISLAM | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD SHOFIUL ISLAM | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOSTAB ALI | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MANIK MIAH | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED ANGUR MIAH | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ABU MIAH | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD JOSIM UDDIN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
ZAHED CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED MAHMUDUL HAQUE | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.40k | £70.95k | £89.38k | £105.14k | £131.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.18k | £108.14k | £75.16k | £86.16k | £99.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £28.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") OF THE CIO ARE: A) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHESTER AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR, ALTHOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE BANGLADESHI MUSLIM INHABITANTS THROUGH PRAYER, WORSHIP, RELIGIOUS TEACHINGS AND SERVICES AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC CENTRE; (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF CHESTER AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD (AND IN PARTICULAR, ALTHOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONG THE BANGLADESHI MUSLIM INHABITANTS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 CLIFTON DRIVE
BLACON
CHESTER
CHESHIRE WEST AND CHESTER
CH1 5LT
- Phone:
- 01244665872
- Email:
- monchabali@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window