THE FRIENDS OF SCADBURY PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends help to secure and promote the conservation and protection of Scadbury Park, Chislehurst, in the London Borough of Bromley. They promote its use as a place for quiet, informal recreation, enjoyment and study, help with practical conservation work through voluntary action, and monitor its plants, animals and wildlife habitats and maintain and improve its biodiversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bromley
Governance
- 17 December 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY STEVEN ALLEN | Chair | 12 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Tyler Benjamin Smith | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Frederick Boyce | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Anne Smith | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Paveley | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE DENISE BLEWITT | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.27k | £5.17k | £10.05k | £1.42k | £681 | |
|
Total expenditure | £897 | £4.34k | £6.39k | £2.88k | £819 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 January 2023 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: A) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF SCADBURY PARK "THE PARK" IN CHISLEHURST, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY; B) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF "THE PARK"; C) PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COACH HOUSE
KEMNAL ROAD
CHISLEHURST
BR7 6LT
- Phone:
- 07733260915
- Email:
- info@scadbury-park.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window