THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, LEWISHAM

Charity Number: 1182343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities by way of regular services as a parish church within the Diocese Of Southwark. Further activities are also available by way of various other events relating to the mission of the parish toward people of all ages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £275,049
Total expenditure: £278,986

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 March 2019: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST MARY'S PCC, LEWISHAM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen Philip Hall Chair 06 March 2019
THE PRENDERGAST SCHOOLS TRUST
Recently registered
Peter Larking Trustee 09 May 2022
None on record
John Mark Symons Trustee 09 May 2022
ELIZA ANN SMITH
Received: On time
COUNTESS OF DARTMOUTH AND OTHERS
Received: On time
Christopher Stringfellow Trustee 09 May 2021
None on record
Allister Walker Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Dr Clara Kalu Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Julia Pring Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Chikere Igbokwe Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Heather Barclay Trustee 07 April 2019
IPAS UK
Received: On time
Annette Maria Moses Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
Trevor George Dixon Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
Ayosola Olubunmi Ivackovic Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
Jennifer Lorraine Henry Trustee 01 April 2018
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
Joan Kalchetar McKenzie Trustee 01 April 2018
LEWISHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM GENERAL TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
LEWISHAM ALMHOUSE CHARITY OF JOHN THACKERAY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £119.57k £112.64k £198.38k £137.66k £275.05k
Total expenditure £126.80k £109.85k £119.52k £256.67k £278.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.35k £12.50k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 June 2024 231 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 June 2024 231 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 November 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 November 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
48 LEWISHAM PARK
LONDON
SE13 6QZ
Phone:
02086902682