ROYAL NAVAL SAILING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The RNSA is a Service Sports Association that delivers the sport of sailing and associated activities for the Royal Navy, Royal Marines and their associated Reserve Forces. We operate across the UK and aim to get Service men and women of all sailing abilities actively engaged in our sport. We passionately believe sailing is an ideal vehicle for improving personal skills and military efficiency.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£551,324
Donations and legacies | £234.64k | |
Charitable activities | £211.26k | |
Other trading activities | £39.35k | |
Investments | £17.99k | |
Other | £48.09k |
Total expenditure:
£486,764
Raising funds | £42.71k | |
Charitable activities | £444.06k | |
Other | £0 |
£26,411 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £42.71k | |
Charitable expenditure | £444.06k | |
Retained for future use | £64.56k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £42.71k | |
Charitable expenditure | £444.06k | |
Retained for future use | £90.97k |
People

3 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 May 2019: CIO registration
- RNSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Christopher Reginald Summer Gardner KBE | Chair | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Miles Arthur Bradbury | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Landale | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Katrina Daniels | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
General Gwyn Jenkins CB OBE ADC | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jay | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Fox | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Commander GAVIN PETER MARSHALL | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Commander WAYNE PETER SHIRLEY | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.56m | £493.60k | £361.06k | £551.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £319.58k | £341.77k | £390.11k | £486.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.49m | N/A | N/A | £234.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £21.65k | N/A | N/A | £39.35k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £12.04k | N/A | N/A | £211.26k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £7.83k | N/A | N/A | £17.99k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £29.96k | N/A | N/A | £48.09k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £297.95k | N/A | N/A | £444.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £21.63k | N/A | N/A | £42.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £20.20k | N/A | N/A | £4.94k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £12.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £5.82k | N/A | N/A | £11.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £551.62k | N/A | N/A | £526.43k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £530.98k | N/A | N/A | £677.62k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £203.24k | N/A | N/A | £365.14k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £22.57k | N/A | N/A | £117.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2021 | 230 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 June 2021 | 230 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 May 2019 as amended on 05 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
The object of the CIO is to promote the military efficiency of His Majesty’s Armed Forces in such charitable ways as the trustees think fit with particular reference to: (a) increasing physical and mental fitness and wellbeing (b) fostering esprit de corps; (c) raising morale; and (d) encouraging seamanship, sea sense and sea safety awareness amongst members of the Naval Service, contributing towards the defence of the realm by members of the Naval Service; in particular, (but not by way of limitation), the trustees may further the object through encouraging and facilitating the participation in, and provision of or assisting in the provision of facilities for, water borne activities in the Naval Service.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 HASLAR MARINA
HASLAR ROAD
GOSPORT
PO12 1NU
- Phone:
- 02392521100
- Email:
- ceo@rnsa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window