The Schweitzer Foundation UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in general about Albert Schweitzer's life and work. To promote humane behaviour and the prevention of cruelty and suffering among animals in general. To promote the moral and ethical improvement of humankind by encouraging compassion towards all forms of plant-life and the environment at large. To advance such charitable purposes as the trustees see fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 December 2019: CIO registration
- THE ALBERT SCHWEITZER INSTITUTE (UK) (Working name)
- THE SCHWEITZER INSTITUTE (Working name)
- THE SCHWEITZER INSTITUTE UK (Working name)
- THE ALBERT SCHWEITZER FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENEDICT GRANT RATTIGAN | Chair | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr JAMES NICHOLAS CARLETON PAGET | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||
NICHOLAS PAUL KAYE | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £17.38k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £19.26k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Dec 2019 as amended on 13 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT ALBERT SCHWEITZER’S LIFE AND WORK; (2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOR AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS IN GENERAL; (3) TO PROMOTE THE MORAL AND ETHICAL IMPROVEMENT OF HUMANKIND BY ENCOURAGING COMPASSION TOWARDS ALL FORMS OF PLANT-LIFE AND THE ENVIRONMENT AT LARGE; (4) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Place Cottage
The Green
Rottingdean
BRIGHTON
BN2 7HA
- Phone:
- 07958538870
- Email:
- enquiries@schweitzeruk.org
- Website:
-
schweitzeruk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window