THE KENDAL CHARITY FOR THE AGED AND INFIRM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing for the elderly of Kendal in one bedroom flats and bungalows. The Almshouse occupiers must be in need and are means tested. A monthly maintenance contribution, currently £190, is made towards the cost of maintaining the almshouse. The charity is financially sound and the dwellings are in excellent order.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 04 October 2019: CIO registration
- 20 April 2021: Funds received from 223344 THE MAYOR OF KENDAL'S FUND FOR THE AGED AND INFIRM
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN NELSON | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Pealing | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Mitchell | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Alan Reed | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|||||
JOHN GEOFFREY STEWART | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Marilyn Waiting | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Garry Schofield Waiting | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
PHILIP EDWARD BALL | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.34k | £93.64k | £97.00k | £109.17k | £135.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.49k | £134.98k | £135.92k | £201.30k | £103.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HOMES OR ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR POOR, AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF KENDAL AND THE IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD (THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 2. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 3. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR, AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
115 STAINBANK ROAD
KENDAL
LA9 5DH
- Phone:
- 01539724742
- Website:
-
kendal-mayor-housing.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window