ORANGE TREE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust supports the well-being, education, culture, health (including mental health) and social needs of refugees and the homeless; academic research in the arts, humanities, medicine and social sciences; and citizenship and community development projects that give voice to marginalised groups and communities in the UK and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 13 June 2019: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lamiaa Soliman | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Celeste Ricci | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maisha Akil Scafe-Smith | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samaneh Moafi | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rawcliffe | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marwan Kaabour | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Selma Taysir Dabbagh | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zainab Sahar Beyad | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.00k | £85.00k | £240.00k | £625.00k | £2.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.90k | £123.28k | £74.11k | £347.47k | £154.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £625.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £347.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £341.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 11 June 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 11 June 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUL 2018 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tower House
226 Cromwell Road
London
SW5 0SW
- Phone:
- 02073709990
- Email:
- info@orangetreetrust.org
- Website:
-
orangetreetrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window