YARM WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 513342
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational outings and lectures, conferences, crafts and sports activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Total income: £851
Total expenditure: £879
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 December 1982: Standard registration
- 07 September 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 September 2021: Funds transferred to 513932 TEESSIDE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39k | £1.90k | £1.57k | £1.26k | £851 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £1.94k | £1.50k | £1.29k | £879 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 06 January 2020 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 20 August 2018 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
YARM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window