THE MESSENGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Messengers provided support and encouragement to Christians in countries where they are restricted or persecuted in practicing their faith, with particular emphasis given to the needs of the tribal or minority groups. Financial funding has been provided for Myanmar/English bibles, the Hope of Children School in Dhaka, Rohingya refugees, flood victims and those affected by Covid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bangladesh
- Bhutan
- Burma
- Cambodia
- China
- India
- Laos
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
- Vietnam
Governance
- 03 October 2019: CIO registration
- 10 February 2021: Funds received from 1065621 THE MESSENGERS
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jonathan Philip Walter | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
RUTH WALTER | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN CHARLES IBBETT | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Yolanda Alexandra Ibbett | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Philip Walter | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Nicola Margaret Walter | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.65k | £65.92k | £43.11k | £37.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.07k | £72.83k | £49.43k | £39.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
3.1. THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH; AND 3.1.2. THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR AMONGST TRIBAL OR MINORITY GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 ROMAN PADDOCK
HARROLD
BEDFORD
MK43 7FR
- Phone:
- 07772407605
- Email:
- office@themessengers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window