Trustees THE LANCASHIRE FAMILY HISTORY AND HERALDRY SOCIETY

Charity number: 513437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sheila Jeanette Court Chair 08 October 2018
None on record
Megan Roberts Trustee 18 May 2024
None on record
OLIVE THEXTON Trustee 13 March 2019
None on record
SUSAN ELIZABETH FOSTER Trustee 17 May 2014
None on record
MARIAN CROSSLEY Trustee 21 June 2012
None on record
MICHAEL PATRICK COYLE Trustee 22 October 2011
None on record
G ANTHONY FOSTER BA MA Trustee
None on record
JOHN DALTON BSC LRIC Trustee
DALTON GENEALOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE LANCASHIRE PARISH REGISTER SOCIETY
Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
STEPHEN THOMAS BENSON MBA Trustee
None on record
EILEEN JOYCE BULLOCK Trustee
None on record
HAZEL JOHNSON Trustee
None on record