Accounts and annual returns THE ARTS SOCIETY HELMSLEY

Charity Number: 1181742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 20 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required