ALL SAINTS BROUGHTON CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for the care and maintenance of All Saints' Church, Broughton-in-Airedale, and its ministry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Revd Canon NICHOLAS ANTHONY TURNER | Chair | 12 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Miles Taylor | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Annette Goldsmith | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Stephanie Anne Harrison | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Janet Mary Hale | Trustee | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.57k | £929 | £2.72k | £5.34k | £1.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £2.62k | £1.84k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, ACCORDING TO THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, IN ALL SAINTS' PARISH CHURCH, BROUGHTON-IN-AIREDALE, NORTH YORKSHIRE AND THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF SUCH CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 RALEY DRIVE
BARNSLEY
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
S75 1FL
- Phone:
- 01226215826
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window