WORLD HORIZONS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* Furthering World Horizons in the UK by stimulating interest in evangelism and church planting by outdoor pursuits activities, conferences, promotional activities, training and overseas journeys. * Supporting the work of World Horizons overseas which is completely financially autonomous. * Initiating sustainable development and business projects. * Advancing education * Relieving hardship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Carmarthenshire
- City Of Swansea
- Derbyshire
- Liverpool City
- Luton
- Manchester City
- Pembrokeshire
- Vale Of Glamorgan
- Throughout London
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Cambodia
- France
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- India
- Japan
- Nepal
- Niger
- Northern Ireland
- Spain
- Turkey
- United States
- Venezuela
Governance
- 27 January 1983: Standard registration
- 12 January 2024: Funds received from 1165779 RUSHMERE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- HORIZONS EXPEDITIONS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM MAURICE DAVIES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jane Farndon | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Todd Lambert | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY ROBERT MORRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.05k | £234.31k | £232.51k | £194.23k | £364.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £269.61k | £237.41k | £249.99k | £250.35k | £333.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 NOVEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 JUNE 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 MAY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROPAGATE AND SPREAD THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AND TO ASSIST IN THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1.1 TO RECRUIT, TRAIN AND APPOINT CHRISTIANS IN ESTABLISHING INDIGENOUS, EVANGELISING CHURCHES WORLDWIDE; 3.1.2 TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER RENEWAL OF THE CHRISTIAN CHURCH AND THE DEEPENING OF THE SPIRITUAL LIVES OF CHRISTIANS AND ALSO THE PARTNERSHIP BETWEEN CHRISTIAN CHURCHES, GROUPS, ORGANISATIONS AND MISSIONS; AND 3.1.3 TO ENCOURAGE AND ADVISE CHRISTIANS ON THE START-UP AND DEVELOPMENT OF ENTERPRISES THAT ARE FOCUSED ON GENERATING SOCIAL, ENVIRONMENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND SUSTAINABLE PROFIT, THAT WILL BE USED TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN EVANGELISM, CHURCH PLANTING AND DISCIPLESHIP WORLDWIDE. 3.2 TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND TO HELP AND EDUCATE THEM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS, MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND PRACTISING MEMBERS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 3.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE. 3.4 TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF GIFTS IN KIND, GRANTS OF MONEY OR MEDICAL CARE OR ASSISTANCE, WORLDWIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WORLD HORIZONS CENTRE FOR THE NATIONS
MILLENIUM QUAYS
NORTH DOCK
LLANELLI
CARMARTHENSHIRE
SA15 2LF
- Phone:
- 01554750005
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window