Financial history EXETER DRAMA COMPANY

Charity number: 1181995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.45k £2.35k £7.76k £12.84k £14.20k
Total expenditure £7.39k £1.52k £3.95k £10.98k £16.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A