RISE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RISE will organise new events and could assume the leadership of any existing inter group or inter church events. This could include joint outreach events, Christian faith action activities such as social projects, including co-ordinating the current faith action network. This may make the projects accessible to those who need it and to other partners including the Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 2019: CIO registration
- Love Blackburn with Darwen (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alastair Murdoch | Chair | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Jason Gardner | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Canon James Lawrence | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen Norcross | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN FERGUSON | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Murdoch | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45 | £750 | £21.57k | £29.79k | £29.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £750 | £17.51k | £21.92k | £34.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH DOCTRINES OUTLINED IN THE NICENE CREED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN AND THE NEARBY AREAS WITHIN EAST LANCASHIRE. IN ACHIEVING ITS PURPOSE, THE CIO WILL CARRY OUT A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES, EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS, WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-73 KING WILLIAM STREET
BLACKBURN
BB1 7DT
- Phone:
- 01614400131
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window