GAMBLING WITH LIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support families who have been bereaved by gambling related suicides, with peer support and access to counselling Raise awareness amongst gamblers, their families and friends, and health professionals of the dangerous effects of gambling on mental health and the high suicide risk, through our website and other social media
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,247,064
Donations and legacies | £896.71k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £350.35k |
Total expenditure:
£856,260
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £856.26k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £856.26k | |
Retained for future use | £390.80k |
People

9 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Janet Anne O'Sullivan | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leroy White | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Smriti Singh | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Campbell | Trustee | 18 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter Keogh | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Katis | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy FURNESS | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|||||
GREGORY CHALLIS | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES RITCHIE | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.45k | £3.33m | £535.64k | £100.04k | £1.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.26k | £551.26k | £702.96k | £1.05m | £856.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £3.33m | £37.64k | N/A | £896.71k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £498.00k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £350.35k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £551.26k | £702.96k | N/A | £856.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £14.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £534 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £2.81m | £2.66m | N/A | £2.11m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £15.97k | £30.62k | N/A | £43.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ADVERSE EFFECTS OF GAMBLING ON HEALTH, AND ESPECIALLY MENTAL HEALTH, TO HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND OTHERS, THROUGH PUBLIC EDUCATION AND SUPPORTING THE DISSEMINATING RESEARCH. (B) TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL DISTRESS AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS SUFFERING BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS DUE TO SUICIDES RELATED TO GAMBLING OR PERSONS AFFECTED BY FAMILY MEMBERS OR FRIENDS WITH GAMBLING ADDICTION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CIRCLE
33 ROCKINGHAM LANE
SHEFFIELD
S1 4FW
- Phone:
- 07955047387
- Email:
- info@gamblingwithlives.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window