MONTGOMERY AREA SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 513787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Scouting facilities, including administration, training and financial management, within the Montgomeryshire Area of the Scout Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £122,738
Total expenditure: £145,586

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MONTGOMERYSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
  • MONTGOMERYSHIRE COUNTY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Ann Wilkins Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
David Clifford Morris Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Neil Kenrick Grant Trustee 07 December 2016
ROTARY CLUB OF NEWTOWN TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Peter Rodney Cadwallader Trustee 06 December 2016
None on record
Andrew William Chick Trustee 05 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.05k £25.13k £3.48k £13.24k £122.74k
Total expenditure £21.04k £5.44k £9.68k £8.52k £145.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 December 2020 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LLYS YR ONNEN
FORGE
MACHYNLLETH
SY20 8RZ
Phone:
07528566903