Financial history SFAC

Charity number: 1186903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £80.40k £74.46k £88.33k £108.29k £124.69k
Total expenditure £3.11k £77.55k £78.81k £101.25k £138.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.53k N/A N/A N/A