SJC QUEEN'S SQUARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Christian faith, responding to human need by loving service and to transform society by developing community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEPHEN BURSTON | Chair | 22 November 2019 | ||||||
Liam Clark | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARK BARRY CHAPPELL | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.78k | £77.10k | £519 | £4.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £960 | £3.26k | £824 | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2022 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2022 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, PROVIDING PASTORAL CARE AND CARRYING OUT MISSIONARY AND OUTREACH WORK; AND (B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CRAWLEY (AND/OR OTHER AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT) AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PARISH OFFICE
CHURCH WALK
CRAWLEY
RH10 1HH
- Phone:
- 01293522692
- Email:
- connect@churchcrawley.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window