THE PROBERT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees will apply the income and, at their discretion, all or part of the capital of the charity in furthering its objects. The aims and objectives of the charity will be fulfilled principally by channelling grants via The Suffolk Community Foundation to grassroots charities addressing deprivation in Suffolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Anne Probert | Trustee | 28 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Thomas Henry Carwardine Probert | Trustee | 27 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Thomas Carwardine Probert | Trustee | 27 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Charles Robert Barker Hewitson | Trustee | 27 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.46k | £20.71k | £53.60k | £22.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.14k | £44.87k | £62.25k | £22.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUFFOLK AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS, THE RELIEF OF NEED, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND DEPRIVATION, AND THE PROMOTION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE CULTURAL, LANDSCAPE AND BUILT HERITAGE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT PRINCIPALLY BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS. 2. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Great Bevills
Sudbury Road
Bures
CO8 5JW
- Phone:
- 01787227237
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window