TECHNOLOGY, PEDAGOGY AND EDUCATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Technology, Pedagogy and Education Association (TPEA) promotes research and effective practice in the use of digital technologies in education and the teaching of computing. It supports teacher education and continuing teacher professional development through sharing resources; publishing and promoting research; organising events and opportunities to share expertise and learn from others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Frances Hidson | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher David Darwent SFHEA, MEd | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Connell | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Prof. Sarah Younie | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Paul Csizmadia | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Christopher James Shelton PhD | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CHARLES TARRANT | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.97k | £28.06k | £23.37k | £27.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.58k | £16.01k | £15.42k | £18.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: · PROMOTING RESEARCH AND EFFECTIVE PRACTICE IN THE USE OF DIGITAL TECHNOLOGIES IN EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, IN SCHOOLS; AND · SUPPORTING INITIAL AND CONTINUING TEACHER PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT, IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF THE EFFECTIVE USE OF EDUCATIONAL TECHNOLOGIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 OLD GLOUCESTER STREET
LONDON
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- enquiries@tpea.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window