COMMUNITIES 1ST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Communities 1st develops, connects and supports local voluntary and community organisations, helping to improve the quality of peoples lives across the districts of Hertfordshire and neighbouring counties. We are home to the local Volunteer Centre, providing support and guidance for those who want to become volunteers and those who want to recruit volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,352,470
Donations and legacies | £1.34m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.51k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,320,325
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.32m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £639,723 from 6 government contract(s) and £111,168 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.32m | |
Retained for future use | £32.15k |
People

46 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Bedford
- Cambridgeshire
- Enfield
- Essex
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
- Norfolk
- Peterborough City
- Suffolk
Governance
- COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE FOR ST. ALBANS DISTRICT (Working name)
- COMMUNITY ACTION HERTSMERE (Working name)
- COMMUNITY CENTRAL (Working name)
- COMMUNITY HERTSMERE (Working name)
- HERTSMERE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason John | Chair | 11 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Roberta Beaton | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOWSON | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Pearlman | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|||||
ANN ROGERS | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Joy Carolyn Dobbs | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER NORMAN CLOKE | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Muriel Harrison | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
KARL DAMIAN WILDING | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Helen YEXLEY | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Ross Gemmell | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £723.77k | £1.37m | £1.77m | £1.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £564.04k | £961.08k | £1.41m | £1.32m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £781.79k | £807.88k | £639.72k | |
|
Income from government grants | £283.90k | £312.98k | £370.47k | £111.17k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £1.37m | £1.74m | £1.34m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £439.79k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £53 | £458 | £11.51k | |
|
Income - Other | £40 | £4.10k | £26.36k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £564.04k | £961.08k | £1.41m | £1.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.88k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £30.43k | £75.90k | £93.71k | £173.97k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £490.73k | £1.19m | £1.20m | £1.33m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £256.15k | £593.63k | £263.01k | £440.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAR 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
A) THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; AND DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT IT IS BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET ITS NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; B) UNDERTAKE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY DEEMS NECESSARY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ver House
Park Industrial Estate
Frogmore
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL2 2WH
- Phone:
- 01727 649900
- Email:
- us@communities1st.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window