WIGMORE LAWN TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO's objectives are the advancement of amateur sport and the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation by (not exclusively) the provision of facilities and resources to enable the playing and coaching of tennis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 06 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Pamela Barrett | Chair | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Terry | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Randles | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clemency Sauvary | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Nicholson Thomas | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Knipe | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH O'DWYER | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Deeley | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Hopkins | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Madeleine Redfern | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|||||
DORIS PUI LING KO | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.06k | £177.77k | £214.78k | £218.58k | £234.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.76k | £139.74k | £196.33k | £213.97k | £256.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT AND THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES TO ENABLE THE PLAYING AND COACHING OF TENNIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 BECMEAD AVENUE
LONDON
SW16 1UJ
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- wigmoretennis@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window