THE TIFFIN SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The role of The Tiffin School Foundation is, for the benefit of the public, to support the provision and conduct of Tiffin School or to advance such other exclusively charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) connected with Tiffin School as the charity trustees may in their discretion think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£516,614
Donations and legacies | £476.07k | |
Charitable activities | £8.40k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £32.14k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£158,647
Raising funds | £324 | |
Charitable activities | £158.32k | |
Other | £0 |
£94,745 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £324 | |
Charitable expenditure | £158.32k | |
Retained for future use | £357.97k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £324 | |
Charitable expenditure | £158.32k | |
Retained for future use | £452.71k |
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 09 September 2019: CIO registration
- 29 January 2021: Funds received from 312997 TIFFIN SCHOOL FOUNDATION
- THE TIFFIN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pip Phillip Phillips | Chair | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Lester | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Anthony Millard | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Nutt | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Dickins | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Strong | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Geoffrey Church | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tupper | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher O'Connell | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HASLER-WINTER | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PAUL KING | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|||||
JOHN KELVIN LULHAM | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|||||
JAMES ANDREW TURNER | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.82k | £339.81k | £342.91k | £516.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £872.90k | £150.48k | £159.00k | £158.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £476.07k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.40k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.14k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £158.32k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £324 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.83k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.13m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.05m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 09 SEP 2019 AMENDED ON 09 OCT 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO SUPPORT THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF TIFFIN SCHOOL. 2) TO PROMOTE THE PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF: A) PRESENT PUPILS OF TIFFIN SCHOOL AND THEIR FAMILIES; B) FORMER PUPILS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH TIFFIN SCHOOL, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH ALUMNI SPORTING CLUBS; AND C) THE LOCAL COMMUNITY OF KINGSTON-UPON-THAMES, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE. 3) TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) CONNECTED WITH TIFFIN SCHOOL AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PRESENT AND FORMER PUPILS OF TIFFIN SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tiffin School
Queen Elizabeth Road
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT2 6RL
- Phone:
- 02085464638
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window