INSPIRE AFRIKA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in Kenya supporting education of underprivileged children, in the form of sponsorship towards this cost.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kenya
Governance
- 29 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sallyann Wright | Chair | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paula Louise Burns | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Neil Burns | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.85k | £6.28k | £1.93k | £959 | £28.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.31k | £0 | £20 | £60 | £23.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 March 2025 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 208 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2022 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2022 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN AGED 4 TO 14 LIVING IN NAKURU, KENYA, AND BY PROVIDING FUNDS FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE SCHOOL BUILDING AND ASSISTING CHILDREN TO ATTEND SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 AUCKLAND ROAD
KINGSWINFORD
DY6 8JQ
- Phone:
- 07881573159
- Email:
- info@inspireafrika.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window