TWO CHURCHES ONE TOWN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's activities are the pursuit of the objects contained in its Articles of Association, which are: 1 To preserve for the public benefit Beverley Minster & St Mary's Church 2 The advancement of education of the public 3 The promotion of arts for the public benefit in Beverley and the surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Julian Carlisle | Chair | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHARLES SHERIDAN HALL | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Christina Cerutti | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jonathan Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Gilson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
David Richard Kilburn | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ian Townsend | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev. Canon Jonathan William Baker | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LESLIE MARR | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|||||
REV REBECCA ALISON LUMLEY | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.66k | £75.65k | £78.33k | £128.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.59k | £143.49k | £12.36k | £56.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JUL 2019 as amended on 01 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 3.1 TO PRESERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CHURCHES KNOWN AS BEVERLEY MINSTER (BEING THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JOHN AND ST MARTIN, BEVERLEY) AND ST MARY'S CHURCH, BEVERLEY (TOGETHER, THE CHURCHES), BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, REPAIR, CONSERVATION, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION AND IMPROVED MANAGEMENT OF THE CHURCHES AND OF MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCHES AND IN THE CHURCHYARDS AND OTHER LAND AND BUILDINGS BELONGING TO THE CHURCHES; 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PROMOTION OF THE CHURCHES AS PLACES OF HERITAGE WITH HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL VALUE; (B) FACILITATING AN IMPROVED UNDERSTANDING OF THE HERITAGE OF THE CHURCHES; (C) THE PROVISION FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO RESTORATION, RESEARCH, HERITAGE AND PUBLIC RELATIONS) 3.3 THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BEVERLEY AND SURROUNDING AREA BY FACILITATING AND HOSTING ARTS EVENTS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE INVOLVING MUSIC AND LITERATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Rollits LLP
Citadel House
58 High Street
HULL
HU1 1QE
- Phone:
- 01482871540
- Email:
- tim.carlisle@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window