NEWARK AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of agriculture and related industries via the Nottinghamshire County , Midlands Machinery and Newark Vintage Tractor Shows. Home to Notts YFC, Long Service medals, the loan of equipment to related organisations, and local shows' conference. Grants for Nottinghamshire agricultural machinery apprentices and students, educational sponsorship. Venue hire through a Trading Company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£2,897,000
Donations and legacies | £8.00k | |
Charitable activities | £560.00k | |
Other trading activities | £2.31m | |
Investments | £18.00k | |
Other | £4.00k |
Total expenditure:
£2,855,000
Raising funds | £1.46m | |
Charitable activities | £1.39m | |
Other | £0 |
£8,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £14,468 from 3 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.46m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.39m | |
Retained for future use | £42.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.46m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.39m | |
Retained for future use | £50.00k |
People

66 Employee(s)
32 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 19 July 1983: Standard registration
- NEWARK SHOWGROUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
32 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER JAMES JACKSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Ian Maurice Sheldon | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
CLARE ANN Leggott | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Patrick William White | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
David Angus Harbottle | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mary Brown | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JULIA DAVIES | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Charles Edward Wright | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy Hordern Farr | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Ruth Hallam | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Benjamin Knowles | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID PICK | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
COLONEL ROGER MERRYWEATHER TD DL | Trustee | 19 December 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Tony Aspbury | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Liz Lambert | Trustee | 05 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Neil Clarke | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|||||||||
LADY HELEN NALL | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Tony Strawson | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Kate Thomas | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Jenny Saint | Trustee | 05 December 2010 |
|
|
||||||||
David John Rhodes | Trustee | 01 December 2010 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN PAUL BRYDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS RACHEL GASCOINE FRICS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
ROGER EDWARD PYKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
RICHARD ALVEY SHELDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
ANGELA MARY HARDSTAFF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MR ROBIN HALL FRICS FAAV | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DAVID M LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MR DES ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
CLIVE IAN APPLEWHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MR CHARLIE WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
BOB SHELDON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01m | £1.06m | £2.39m | £2.84m | £2.90m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.11m | £1.21m | £2.33m | £2.74m | £2.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £123.87k | £63.06k | £19.01k | £14.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | £426.00k | £12.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.23k | £12.00k | £27.00k | £8.00k | £8.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.53m | £597.00k | £1.88m | £2.28m | £2.31m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £325.98k | £17.00k | £476.00k | £534.00k | £560.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.24k | £9.00k | £4.00k | £17.00k | £18.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £141.46k | £421.00k | £8.00k | £2.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £636.00k | £1.12m | £1.31m | £1.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.06m | £578.00k | £1.22m | £1.43m | £1.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.00k | £8.00k | £9.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.61k | £1.63k | £1.66k | £1.39k | £1.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.69m | £2.50m | £2.51m | £2.78m | £2.85m | |
|
Long-term investments | £313.39k | £334.00k | £305.00k | £288.00k | £296.00k | |
|
Other assets | £662.16k | £1.12m | £1.23m | £915.00k | £837.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £981.35k | £1.41m | £1.47m | £1.33m | £1.28m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE AND TO SUCH END GENERALLY TO IMPROVE IT IN ALL ITS BRANCHES AND TO ENCOURAGE SKILL AND INDUSTRY IN IT AND IN ALL TRADES, CRAFTS AND PROFESSIONS CONNECTED WITH IT. (2) TO PROMOTE INDUSTRY IN GENERAL. (3) TO HOLD IN PURSUANCE OF ITS MAIN OBJECT AN ANNUAL AGRICULTURAL SHOW PROVIDED THAT THE SOCIETY SHALL NOT BE OBLIGED TO HOLD A SHOW IN ANY YEAR IN RELATION TO WHICH THE COUNCIL OF THE SOCIETYSHALL RESOLVE THAT THE HOLDING OF SUCH SHOW IS IMPRACTICABLE OR NOT IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWARK & NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
THE COUNTY SHOWGROUND
WINTHORPE NEWARK
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG24 2NY
- Phone:
- 01636705796
- Email:
- info@newarkshowground.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window