Trustees BARNSLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 514094
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Eggleston | Chair | 12 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Laura Elizabeth Simpson | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Judith Ann Doxey | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alison Lamb | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Neil Leatherland | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
George Akid | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Simon Peter Alliott | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Amelia Eggleston | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Diana Greaves | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Helen Arthur | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Ann Oxley | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
MELVYN LUNN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.