BUDHBARI BAZAR UNION WELFARE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT FLOOD VICTIM ; RIVER EROSION BUILD HOUSE FOR DISADVANTAGE PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 30 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Gulzar Hussain | Chair | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
TAJ UDDIN | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
Siddiqur Rahman | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Nunu Mohammad Sheikh | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Saleh Ahmed | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
SIBBIR AHMED | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Mohammed Mujibur Rahman | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Mohammed Iqbal Hossain | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Koyes Ahmed Ruhel | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MOHAMMED MUJIBUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 23 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.19k | £5 | £14.78k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.79k | £9 | £8.73k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2022 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTER IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID AND LIFE BOATS TO SUCH PERSON
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 PIER STREET
LONDON
E14 3HR
- Phone:
- 07850347684
- Email:
- mghussain19@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window