NIDDERDALE AND PATELEY BRIDGE MEN'S SHED C.I.O.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The "Pateley Shed" works for the public benefit addressing rural isolation & social exclusion amongst mainly men in Nidderdale N Yorkshire. A key driver is providing a renewed sense of belonging & purpose through the provision of facilities in which they can meet to undertake physical or recreational activities, learn & pass on skills; supporting each other and providing a "listening ear".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 June 2019: CIO registration
- PATELEY SHED (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Ian Tattersfield | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Glyndon John Burgess | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Paterson Murdoch | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
David Robert Craggs | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael John Beer | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £4.23k | £13.98k | £8.08k | £7.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14 | £2.15k | £11.32k | £9.05k | £8.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £997 | £3.50k | £2.26k | £725 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG MEN AGED 18 YEARS AND OLDER, LIVING IN NIDDERDALE AND PATELEY BRIDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED, UNEMPLOYED OR HAVE HEALTH PROBLEMS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HOBBIES, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS INCLUDING PRACTICAL INTERESTS, SKILLS SHARING, THE LEARNING OF NEW SKILLS, AND HELPING WITH COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Church Avenue
Dacre Banks
HARROGATE
HG3 4EB
- Phone:
- 01423780441
- Email:
- alancottrill@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window