MISSION REMISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve those in need by reason of ill-health by developing and facilitating support services for cancer survivors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jane Spurgeon | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Gavin Wilkinson | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Mary Tully | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Sarifa Patel | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Dr Christine Linda Oates | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Morgan | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Ryan Pickett | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2020 | 01/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.79k | £25.18k | £67.34k | £130.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.76k | £21.20k | £55.01k | £66.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £11.42k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £16.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | 17 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH BY DEVELOPING AND FACILITATING SUPPORT SERVICES FOR CANCER SURVIVORS, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY: DEVELOPING AND MAKING AVAILABLE DIGITAL FORUMS AND RESOURCES TO CONNECT THOSE IN NEED WITH EACH OTHER
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 Tanner Street
London
SE1 3GN
- Phone:
- 07717562596
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window